CT SB00896 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To improve transparency and establish standards for the removal of trees that constitute an immediate public hazard at state parks and campgrounds.
Title
An Act Concerning Tree Removal On Properties Under The Control Of The Department Of Energy And Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] | Rep. Jane Garibay [D] |
Sen. Robert Sampson [R] | Sen. John Kissel [R] | Sen. Jeff Gordon [R] | Sen. Eric Berthel [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 333 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 239 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 239 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Public Act 23-206 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-06-07 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-07 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-24 | House | House Calendar Number 580 |
2023-05-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-23 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8494 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | File Number 173 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 118 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 01/30 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |