CT SB00896 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-27 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide greater efficiency in the processing of site plan and subdivision applications.
Title
An Act Making Procedural Changes To The Site Plan And Subdivision Application Process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-28 | File Number 218 | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Calendar Number 171 | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-28 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-07 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-14 | Public Hearing 02/18 | |
2011-02-04 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |