CT SB00886 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide support for residents to safely and effectively "age in place" in a setting of their choice.
Title
An Act Concerning Aging In Place.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 424 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 358 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 358 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Public Act 13-250 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House Calendar Number 634 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-22 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7499 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-14 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6671 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-03 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2013-03-25 | Senate | File Number 111 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 138 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |