CT SB00883 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Governor's Council On Women And Girls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 285 AS AMENDED (Y: 113 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 169 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 169 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Public Act 21-49 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 491 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8539 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | File Number 513 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 301 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |