CT SB00883 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make various changes to statutes relating to the Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services and repeal certain other statutes relating to the department.
Title
An Act Concerning Various Revisions To Statutes Concerning The Department Of Mental Health And Addiction Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 87 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-215 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed | |
2011-04-28 | House Calendar Number 399 | |
2011-04-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-27 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Passed | |
2011-03-21 | File Number 112 | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Calendar Number 117 | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-21 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-07 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-07 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-04 | Public Hearing 02/09 | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |