CT SB00882 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide private sector employees with the same protection from liability currently afforded to public sector employees who complete performance evaluations on contractors and subcontractors.
Title
An Act Concerning The State Set-aside Program, Filing Requirements Of State Contractors, Evaluation Of Contractors And Subcontractors And A Program To Increase Contracts Awarded To Resident Bidders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 360 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 353 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 353 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-229 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-03 | House Calendar Number 596 | |
2011-06-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-06-02 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7297 | |
2011-05-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-18 | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-05-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-17 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-11 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-04 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-03 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-03 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-03 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-27 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-20 | File Number 599 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Calendar Number 368 | |
2011-04-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-01 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-02-02 | Public Hearing 02/07 | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |