CT SB00880 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require state agency regulations to be posted on the Internet web site of the state agency adopting such regulations.
Title
An Act Concerning Guidelines For The Department Of Education For The Charging Of Fees For Certain Records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-02 | No New File by Committee on Education | |
2011-05-02 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-02 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-29 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-27 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education | |
2011-04-20 | File Number 603 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Calendar Number 367 | |
2011-04-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-01 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-02-02 | Public Hearing 02/07 | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |