CT SB00871 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - House Calendar Number 532
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - House Calendar Number 532
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To revise the higher education and employment advancement statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Endowed Chair Investment Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 146 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7339 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 147 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 147 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 532 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7339 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | File Number 412 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 216 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |