CT SB00852 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical revisions to statutes concerning the Department of Motor Vehicles.
Title
An Act Making Revisions To Statutes Concerning The Department Of Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Joint - TRA Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | File Number 411 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 226 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |