CT SB00850 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Department of Education to study issues affecting public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning An Exemption From The Licensing Requirements For Child Care Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 385 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 66 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24SenatePublic Act 19-122
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-26SenateHouse Calendar Number 507
2019-04-26SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-24SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-24SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-24SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7211
2019-04-10SenateFile Number 593
2019-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 283
2019-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
2019-03-27SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-25SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-15SenatePublic Hearing 02/22
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback