CT SB00844 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Department of Public Health regarding revisions to the statutes concerning the human immunodeficiency virus.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendations Regarding Revisions To The Statutes Concerning The Human Immunodeficiency Virus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House Roll Call Vote 141 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 95 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 95 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 17-6 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-05-11 | Senate | House Passed |
2017-05-05 | Senate | House Calendar Number 472 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | File Number 472 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 248 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |