CT SB00842 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Authorizing And Adjusting Bonds Of The State For Capital Improvements, Transportation, Elimination Of The Accumulated Gaap Deficit And Other Purposes.
Title
An Act Authorizing And Adjusting Bonds Of The State For Capital Improvements, Transportation, Elimination Of The Accumulated Gaap Deficit And Other Purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 397 AS AMENDED (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 396 SENATE AMD A (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 559 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 558 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 8821 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 557 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8783 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 396 SENATE AMD A (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 559 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 558 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 8821 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 557 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8783 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Public Act 13-239 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-04 | Senate | House Calendar Number 689 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8821 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8783 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | File Number 677 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 491 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |