CT SB00829 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify the elements of the offense of unlicensed practice of law and increase the penalty for such offense.
Title
An Act Concerning The Unauthorized Practice Of Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - House Roll Call Vote 188 (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 166 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 166 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Public Act 13-29 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-05-15 | Senate | House Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | House Calendar Number 446 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | File Number 185 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 190 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |