CT SB00828 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require a person found not guilty of a sexual offense by reason of mental disease or defect who is granted temporary leave to a residential setting by the Psychiatric Security Review Board to register as a sexual offender with the Commissioner of Emergency Services and Public Protection.
Title
An Act Concerning Sexual Offender Registration Requirements For Certain Persons Granted Temporary Leave By The Psychiatric Security Review Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - House Roll Call Vote 245 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 253 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 235 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 6615 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 253 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 235 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 6615 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Public Act 13-73 |
2013-05-22 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-05-22 | Senate | House Passed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | House Calendar Number 577 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 6615 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | File Number 605 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 449 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |