CT SB00827 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Banks
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Banks
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To update public deposit laws.
Title
An Act Concerning Public Deposits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Banks |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-02 | Senate | File Number 259 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 214 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |