CT SB00821 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - House Calendar Number 465
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - House Calendar Number 465
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To equalize Medicaid rates for primary care or treating practitioners at federally qualified health centers for electronic consultation services with such rates for other primary care or treating practitioners and to pay such rates in addition to fixed fees per patient visit.
Title
An Act Concerning Equitable Medicaid Reimbursement For Federally Qualified Health Center Practitioners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 40 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | House Calendar Number 465 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | File Number 104 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 71 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |