CT SB00820 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To expand eligibility under the Small Business Express program to include primary care physicians and physician offices regardless of the number of employees.
Title
An Act Concerning The Participation Of Primary Care Physicians In The Small Business Express Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 378 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 413 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 154 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 413 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 154 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Special Act 17-22 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8710 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 530 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7233 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | File Number 408 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 205 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |