CT SB00806 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To enable partnerships among the state, municipalities and land trusts to acquire development rights to agricultural lands in order to preserve such lands.
Title
An Act Concerning The Municipal Purchase Of Development Rights For Agricultural Land Preservation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 217 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 173 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 173 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Public Act 13-59 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | House Calendar Number 443 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-16 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2013-04-04 | Senate | File Number 338 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 249 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |