CT SB00805 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Environment
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Environment
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make Connecticut's oysters competitive in the boutique oyster raw bar market.
Title
An Act Concerning The Taking Of Eastern Oysters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Environment |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-15 | Senate | File Number 479 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 361 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |