CT SB00795 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To protect physicians and other health care professionals who use automated external defibrillators in the scope of their practice or employment against civil liability when the automatic external defibrillator malfunctions.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Automatic External Defibrillators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 386 (Y: 138 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 376 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 376 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-24 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-24 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-20 | House | Public Act 19-113 |
2019-06-05 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | House | House Calendar Number 736 |
2019-06-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-06-05 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7270 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | File Number 8 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 21 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/26/19 5:00 PM |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/04 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |