CT SB00762 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To give state agencies the discretion to remove information from their Internet web sites.
Title
An Act Concerning The Removal Of Information From State Agency Internet Web Sites.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Government Administration and Elections |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-24 | Senate | File Number 601 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 439 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |