CT SB00759 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow the community spouse of an institutionalized individual to live independently longer by retaining the maximum amount of assets permissible under Medicaid eligibility rules.
Title
An Act Permitting A Community Spouse Of An Institutionalized Spouse To Retain The Maximum Amount Of Allowable Assets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2017-03-02 | Senate | File Number 18 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 50 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/01/17 5:00 PM |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |