CT SB00756 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Public Hearing 02/19
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Public Hearing 02/19
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Consumer Protection to prescribe the form of a standardized contract to be used state-wide for the sale of residential real property in the state.
Title
An Act Requiring A State-wide Standardized Contract Form For The Sale Of Residential Real Property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |