CT SB00753 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Public Hearing 02/26
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Public Hearing 02/26
Pending: Joint Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Connecticut Health Insurance Exchange to hold a public hearing prior to charging an assessment or user fee, or changing the amount of an assessment or user fee charged, to a health carrier.
Title
An Act Requiring The Connecticut Health Insurance Exchange To Hold A Public Hearing Prior To Charging An Assessment Or User Fee, Or Changing The Amount Of An Assessment Or User Fee Charged, To A Health Carrier.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |