CT SB00752 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - House Calendar Number 650
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - House Calendar Number 650
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require life insurance companies to provide with any life insurance policy proceeds payment the information needed for a beneficiary to complete an Internal Revenue Service Form 712.
Title
An Act Requiring Life Insurance Companies To Provide Certain Information With Life Insurance Policy Proceeds Payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 288 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 650 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-27 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | File Number 46 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 91 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/15 5:00 PM |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |