CT SB00705 | 2021 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To establish an Office of Pandemic and Public Health Preparedness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing An Office Of Pandemic And Public Health Preparedness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/21 10:00 AM
2021-04-22SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2021-04-21SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2021-03-22SenatePublic Hearing 03/26
2021-03-19SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations
2021-03-18SenateDrafted by Committee
2021-02-16SenateVote to Draft
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback