CT SB00691 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Veterans' Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Veterans' Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Department of Veterans' Affairs to operate a toll-free veterans' crisis hotline.
Title
An Act Establishing A Veterans' Crisis Line.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Veterans' Affairs |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-19 | Senate | File Number 131 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 140 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |