CT SB00630 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
Pending: Joint Energy and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-17 - Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
Pending: Joint Energy and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the renewable portfolio standards in the future to better incentivize the use of renewable energy sources.
Title
An Act Concerning The Renewable Portfolio Standard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |