CT SB00619 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To update the Commission on Connecticut's Future and require the commission to meet by October 1, 2013, and produce a report by December 1, 2014.
Title
An Act Concerning The Commission On Connecticut's Future.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 163 (Y: 116 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 162 (Y: 45 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 179 PASS (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Roll Call Vote 162 (Y: 45 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 179 PASS (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Public Act 13-19 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-05-14 | Senate | House Passed |
2013-05-14 | Senate | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 6978 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | House Calendar Number 486 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | File Number 384 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 277 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |