CT SB00586 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - Bill Passed Temporary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-07 - Bill Passed Temporary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To: (1) Expand mandated health benefits for women, children and adolescents; (2) expand mandated contraception benefits; and (3) require the Commissioner of Social Services to amend the Medicaid state plan to provide expanded contraception benefits.
Title
An Act Expanding Mandated Health Benefits For Women, Children And Adolescents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 271 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 9 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-09 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 9 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-09 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | House | Bill Passed Temporary |
2017-06-02 | House | House Calendar Number 619 |
2017-06-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-06-01 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8326 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8258 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | File Number 242 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 147 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 10:00 AM |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |