CT SB00564 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide for annual stack testing for mercury emissions after the owner or operator of an affected unit complies with applicable mercury emission standards for a period of eight consecutive calendar quarters.
Title
An Act Concerning Mercury Emissions Testing At Certain Power Plants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 210 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 209 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 209 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Public Act 13-58 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | House Calendar Number 547 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-03-20 | Senate | File Number 60 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 119 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 01/30 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |