CT SB00540 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - File Number 633
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - File Number 633
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize sports wagering in the state to the extent permitted under federal law and to authorize the Connecticut Lottery Corporation to offer lottery draw games through the corporation's Internet web site.
Title
An Act Authorizing Sports Wagering And Online Lottery Draw Games In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | File Number 633 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 394 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/02 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |