CT SB00539 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - File Number 559
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - File Number 559
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To delay the date the microbiome working group is required to submit a report and make a presentation on such report.
Title
An Act Concerning A Working Group To Develop A Plan To Foster The Microbiome Sector In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | File Number 559 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 344 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/02 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |