CT SB00526 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 715
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - File Number 715
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management to conduct a study concerning the creation of a municipal option to amend the municipal fiscal year to align with the federal fiscal year.
Title
An Act Requiring A Study Concerning The Creation Of A Municipal Option To Amend The Municipal Fiscal Year To Align With The Federal Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | File Number 715 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 347 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |