CT SB00526 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-07 - Public Hearing 02/14
Pending: Joint Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-07 - Public Hearing 02/14
Pending: Joint Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To protect individuals whose identity has been stolen by granting them access to their bank and credit union account funds.
Title
An Act Allowing Victims Of Identity Theft Access To Bank And Credit Union Account Funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/14 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |