CT SB00522 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To facilitate the administration of prescription drugs to veterans who are patients at nursing home facilities.
Title
An Act Concerning Prescription Drugs Administered By Nursing Homes To Veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-15 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Human Services |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services |
2015-03-19 | Senate | File Number 129 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 138 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |