CT SB00480 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Banking Commissioner to provide a monthly list to the Insurance Commissioner of individuals registered with the Banking Commissioner pursuant to section 36b-6 of the general statutes and those individuals who have had such registration denied, suspended or revoked during the preceding ten years, and to require the Insurance Commissioner to take such denial, suspension or revocation into consideration with respect to application for and continuation of life insurance producer licenses.
Title
An Act Concerning Life Insurance Producer Licenses And Registrations Of Broker-dealers, Agents, Investment Advisers And Investment Adviser Agents, And The Insurance Commissioner's Authority To Deny An Application For An Insurance Producer License.
Sponsors
House Insurance and Real Estate Committee | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] |
Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Sen. Leroy Frantz [R] | Sen. Michael McLachlan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 294 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 454 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 305 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 454 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 305 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Public Act 14-216 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5668 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House Calendar Number 528 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | File Number 395 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 273 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |