CT SB00470 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To create a pilot program to enable and assist a municipality in the reduction of gun violence, to create a set-aside program for certain projects for participants in the pilot program and to authorize bonding for related projects.
Title
An Act Concerning A Pilot Program Fostering Neighborhood Safety And Creating A Set-aside Program For Participants In The Pilot Program, And Authorizing Bonding For Related Projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-25 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-04-14 | Senate | File Number 640 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 413 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/23 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |