CT SB00467 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To prescribe standards for the practice of, and health insurance coverage for, telehealth.
Title
An Act Concerning The Facilitation Of Telehealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - House Roll Call Vote 231 AS AMENDED (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 228 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 228 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Public Act 15-88 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 584 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-19 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7710 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | File Number 693 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 414 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |