CT SB00464 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To promote the manufacturing and sale of Connecticut-made beer.
Title
An Act Establishing A Connecticut Brewery Trail And Requiring The Connecticut Commission On Culture And Tourism To Submit A Report Regarding The Establishment Of A Connecticut Antiques Trail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 367 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 158 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 158 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-227 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-12 | House Calendar Number 490 | |
2011-05-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-11 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 6070 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5602 | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-07 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-06 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-06 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-01 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-03-17 | File Number 72 | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Calendar Number 90 | |
2011-03-17 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-11 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-03 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-03 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | |
2011-02-22 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-02-02 | Public Hearing 02/08 | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |