CT SB00460 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish and amend requirements relating to the conversion of hospitals, to require certificates of need for the termination of inpatient and outpatient reproductive services, to require that certain information be reported by for-profit hospitals to the Office of Health Care Access, to allow the Department of Public Health to award grants-in-aid to nonprofit hospitals for capital improvements and to require the Department of Public Health to review its regulations and to report to the public health and human services committees.
Title
An Act Concerning Hospital Conversions And Other Matters Affecting Hospitals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-25 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-10 | Senate | File Number 488 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 315 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/19 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |