CT SB00458 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Claims Commissioner to report to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to the judiciary on (1) the number of claims that have not been disposed of within two years of the date of filing, and (2) reforms that have been initiated to improve the processing and disposition of claims.
Title
An Act Concerning The Office Of The Claims Commissioner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 291 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 239 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 238 SENATE AMD A (Y: 81 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 295 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 239 AS AMENDED (Y: 85 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 238 SENATE AMD A (Y: 81 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 295 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Public Act 16-127 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-02 | Senate | House Calendar Number 572 |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-05-02 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5789 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | File Number 636 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 409 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |