CT SB00458 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To expand the role of certain municipal law enforcement authorities regarding the renewal of alcoholic liquor permits allowing on-premises consumption of alcoholic beverages.
Title
An Act Concerning Municipal Police Departments And The Renewal Of Certain Alcoholic Liquor Permits.
Sponsors
House General Law Committee | Sen. Edwin Gomes [D] | Sen. Toni Harp [D] | Rep. Roland Lemar [D] |
Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Toni Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 369 AS AMENDED (Y: 115 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 145 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 145 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Special Act 11-14 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-20 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-20 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-05-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-17 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-05-12 | House Calendar Number 489 | |
2011-05-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-11 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5628 | |
2011-04-13 | File Number 500 | |
2011-04-13 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-13 | New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-04-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-05 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-04 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-04-01 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-03-21 | File Number 118 | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Calendar Number 112 | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-21 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-03 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-03 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law | |
2011-02-22 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-02-02 | Public Hearing 02/08 | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |