CT SB00455 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require the Department of Education to take certain actions to recruit and retain minority teachers, amend its regulations relating to teacher certification, issue a provisional educator certificate to certain holders of charter school educator permits, develop a definition of educator effectiveness and issue an initial educator certificate to applicants who have passed a relevant examination or completed advanced coursework, and to revise the membership of the minority teacher recruitment and retention task force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Minority Teacher Recruitment And Retention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 240 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 142 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-05-17SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-05-17SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-16SenatePublic Act 18-34
2018-05-07SenateIn Concurrence
2018-05-07SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-07SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-04SenateHouse Calendar Number 505
2018-05-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-05-02SenateOn Consent Calendar
2018-05-02SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-02SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4842
2018-04-12SenateFile Number 481
2018-04-12SenateSenate Calendar Number 282
2018-04-12SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-12SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-06SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-26SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-23SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-09SenatePublic Hearing 03/14
2018-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Education

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback