CT SB00450 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - File Number 403
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - File Number 403
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit municipalities from entering into collective bargaining agreements that limit the ability of municipalities to permit volunteer services for the benefit of municipalities.
Title
An Act Concerning Municipal Volunteer Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | File Number 403 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 234 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |