CT SB00448 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to study the needs of manufacturers in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning A Request For Proposals For The Operation Of Mobile Manufacturing Training Labs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 265 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13HouseSigned by the Governor
2018-05-31HouseTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-05-31HouseTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-25HouseSpecial Act 18-24
2018-05-09HouseIn Concurrence
2018-05-09HouseOn Consent Calendar
2018-05-09HouseHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-09HouseHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-08HouseHouse Calendar Number 586
2018-05-08HouseFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-05-08HouseTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2018-05-08SenateOn Consent Calendar
2018-05-08SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-08SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5539
2018-04-10SenateFile Number 402
2018-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 233
2018-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-03SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-27SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-27SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-15SenatePublic Hearing 03/20
2018-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback