CT SB00447 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - File Number 479
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - File Number 479
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide a funding source to allow for the timely completion of background checks for school bus drivers.
Title
An Act Concerning Funding To Expedite The Completion Of Background Checks For School Bus Drivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | File Number 479 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 280 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |