CT SB00444 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - File Number 451
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - File Number 451
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require a study of the state's civil laws.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of The Civil Laws Of This State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | File Number 451 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 322 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/22 5:00 PM |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |