CT SB00443 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require the Department of Economic and Community Development to study blockchain technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing The Connecticut Blockchain Working Group.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 266 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 141 ADOPT (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-05-23SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-05-23SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-21SenateSpecial Act 18-8
2018-05-08SenateIn Concurrence
2018-05-08SenateOn Consent Calendar
2018-05-08SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-08SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-04SenateHouse Calendar Number 504
2018-05-04SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-05-02SenateOn Consent Calendar
2018-05-02SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-02SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4903
2018-04-10SenateFile Number 399
2018-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 230
2018-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-03SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-27SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-27SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-15SenatePublic Hearing 03/20
2018-03-07SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback