CT SB00442 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-05 - House Calendar Number 511
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-05 - House Calendar Number 511
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development to conduct an overview of the department's economic development programs.
Title
An Act Concerning Marketing Of The State By First Five Plus Businesses And Other Recipients Of Substantial Financial Assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 185 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-05 | Senate | House Calendar Number 511 |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-04-10 | Senate | File Number 398 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 229 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |